Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/28/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/03/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/03/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/03/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/09/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/22/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/24/2010