Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
01/04/2011 Became Public Law No: 111-348.
01/04/2011 Signed by President.
12/28/2010 Presented to President.
12/21/2010 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to the Senate amendment: CR H8790-8791)
12/20/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2010 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/02/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2879-2880)
01/06/2009 Introduced in House