Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/24/2010