There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Federal building and United States courthouse located at 306 East Main Street in Elizabeth City, North Carolina, as the "J. Herbert W. Small Federal Building and United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
06/30/2009Became Public Law No: 111-34. (TXT | PDF)
06/30/2009Signed by President.
06/19/2009Presented to President.
06/17/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6741)
06/11/2009Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. Without written report.
03/10/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 427 - 0 (Roll no. 114).(text: CR H3114)
03/10/2009Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-27.
02/03/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
06/30/2009Became Public Law No: 111-34. (TXT | PDF)
06/30/2009Signed by President.
06/19/2009HousePresented to President.
06/18/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/17/2009SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6741)
06/11/2009SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 75.
06/11/2009SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. Without written report.
05/14/2009SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/11/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
03/10/2009-2:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/10/2009-2:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 427 - 0 (Roll no. 114). (text: CR H3114)
03/10/2009-2:10pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3126)
03/10/2009-12:44pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/10/2009-12:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 813.
03/10/2009-12:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3114-3115)
03/10/2009-12:36pmHouseMs. Edwards (MD) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/10/2009HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 17.
03/10/2009HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-27.
02/12/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
02/12/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/12/2009HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
02/04/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/03/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
02/03/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/03/2009 Referred to
02/12/2009 Markup by
03/10/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-27
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management02/04/2009 Referred to
02/12/2009 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works03/11/2009 Referred to
05/14/2009 Markup by
06/11/2009 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.813.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.813. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-34 (06/17/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the federal building and U.S. courthouse located at 306 East Main Street in Elizabeth City, North Carolina, as the "J. Herbert W. Small Federal Building and United States Courthouse."