Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/03/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/26/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 02/26/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/26/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/26/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/26/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/26/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/26/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/05/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/12/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/08/2009