Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/04/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/20/2009