Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/14/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/14/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/21/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/27/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/27/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/10/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/29/2010