Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/25/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/27/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/21/2010