Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 02/09/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/05/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/21/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/07/2009