Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/11/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/17/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/18/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/30/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 12/16/2009