Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/24/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/09/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/30/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/05/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/11/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/25/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/07/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/24/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/01/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 11/04/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/04/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/17/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/01/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/13/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/17/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/17/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/12/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/22/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/01/2010