Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/05/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/05/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/05/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/05/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/09/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/09/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/09/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/09/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/09/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/09/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/09/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/09/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/09/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/09/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 03/09/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/09/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/09/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/09/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/09/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/09/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/09/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/09/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/09/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/09/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/09/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/09/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/09/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/09/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/09/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/09/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/09/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/09/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/09/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/09/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/09/2009
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/09/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/09/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/09/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/09/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/09/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/09/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/09/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/09/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/09/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/09/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/09/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/09/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/09/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/10/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/10/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/12/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/12/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/19/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/19/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/19/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/25/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/26/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/31/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/21/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/20/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/04/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/29/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/14/2010