Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/04/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/30/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/30/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/30/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/30/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/30/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/30/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/30/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/30/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/30/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/30/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/30/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/30/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/30/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/30/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/30/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/30/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/30/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/30/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/30/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/30/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/30/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/30/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/30/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/30/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/30/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/30/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/30/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/30/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/30/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/30/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/30/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/30/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/30/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/30/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/30/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/30/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/30/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/01/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/28/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/30/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/04/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/06/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/07/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/14/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/14/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/20/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/20/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/09/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/30/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/30/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/30/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/30/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/30/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/30/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/30/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/30/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/12/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/22/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew