Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/10/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/12/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/12/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/12/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/12/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/12/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/12/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/12/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/02/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/02/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/02/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/02/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/02/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/09/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/09/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/10/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/11/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/11/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/11/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/19/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/19/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/19/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/23/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/01/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/01/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/07/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/22/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew