Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/04/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/05/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 03/05/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/05/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/17/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/18/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/18/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/18/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/18/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/18/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/18/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/18/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/18/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/18/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/18/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/18/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/19/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/19/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/01/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/21/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/23/2009