Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/04/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/09/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 02/09/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/09/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/09/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/09/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/23/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/20/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/15/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/16/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/01/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/02/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/08/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/21/2010