Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/11/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/21/2010