Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/09/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/10/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/24/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/21/2009