Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/26/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/26/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/11/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/11/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/11/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/18/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/22/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 09/28/2010