Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/09/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/12/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/25/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/17/2009