Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/09/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/09/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/09/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/23/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/06/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/19/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/24/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/24/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/08/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/06/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/21/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/19/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/19/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/02/2009