Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/10/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/31/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/31/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/26/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/10/2010