Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/10/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/10/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/11/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/13/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/13/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/23/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/23/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/24/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/24/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/25/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/04/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/05/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/09/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/10/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/11/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/11/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/12/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/23/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/26/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/30/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/21/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/19/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/19/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/09/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/23/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/25/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/25/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/07/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/08/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/09/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/23/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/14/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/16/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 09/16/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/21/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/21/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/26/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/02/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/05/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/06/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/16/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 11/16/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/01/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/02/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/07/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/14/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/12/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/12/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/19/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 01/27/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/13/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/15/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/11/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/08/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/08/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/10/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/29/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/14/2010