Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/16/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/16/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/16/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/16/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/30/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/30/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 03/30/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/06/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/06/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/04/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/10/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/08/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/10/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/08/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/14/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/17/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/24/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 10/08/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/20/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/20/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 11/03/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/06/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/06/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/16/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/16/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 12/16/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/09/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/20/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/28/2010