Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/26/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/14/2010