There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Plain Writing Act of 2010

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Plain Writing Act of 2010

Short Titles as Reported to House

Plain Writing Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

Plain Language Act of 2009

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Plain Writing Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enhance citizen access to Government information and services by establishing that Government documents issued to the public must be written clearly, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/13/2010Became Public Law No: 111-274. (TXT | PDF)
10/13/2010Signed by President.
10/01/2010Presented to President.
09/29/2010Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 341 - 82 (Roll no. 562).(text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H7314)
09/27/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7556)
03/17/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 33 (Roll no. 126).(text: CR H1538)
03/11/2010Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government. H. Rept. 111-432.
02/10/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/13/2010Became Public Law No: 111-274. (TXT | PDF)
10/13/2010Signed by President.
10/01/2010HousePresented to President.
09/29/2010-11:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2010-11:44pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 341 - 82 (Roll no. 562). (text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H7314)
09/29/2010-11:38pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7371-7372)
09/29/2010-8:05pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/29/2010-7:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 946.
09/29/2010-7:53pmHouseMr. Clay moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H7314-7316)
09/28/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/27/2010SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7556)
09/27/2010SenateS.Amdt.4663 Amendment SA 4663 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2010SenateS.Amdt.4663 Amendment SA 4663 proposed by Senator Casey for Senator Akaka. (consideration: CR S7556; text: CR S7556) To modify the definition of plain writing, and for other purposes.
09/27/2010SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7556)
03/18/2010SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 321.
03/17/2010-4:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/17/2010-4:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 33 (Roll no. 126). (text: CR H1538)
03/17/2010-4:46pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1560)
03/17/2010-2:11pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/17/2010-1:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 946.
03/17/2010-1:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1538-1540)
03/17/2010-1:53pmHouseMr. Clay moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/11/2010HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 248.
03/11/2010HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government. H. Rept. 111-432.
03/04/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/04/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
02/10/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
02/10/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform02/10/2009 Referred to
03/04/2010 Markup by
03/11/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-432

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.946. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-274 (10/13/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 27, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Plain Writing Act of 2010 - Requires the head of each executive agency to: (1) designate one or more senior officials within the agency to oversee the agency's implementation of this Act; (2) communicate this Act's requirements to the agency's employees; (3) train agency employees in "plain writing" (defined as writing that is clear, concise, well-organized, and follows other best practices appropriate to the subject or field and intended audience); (4) establish a process for overseeing the agency's ongoing compliance with this Act's requirements; (5) create and maintain a plain writing section of the agency's website that shall inform the public of agency compliance with the requirements of this Act, provide a mechanism for the agency to receive and respond to public input on agency implementation and agency reports required under this Act, and be accessible from its homepage; and (6) designate one or more agency points-of-contact to receive and respond to public input on the implementation of this Act.

Requires each agency, by one year after enactment, to use plain writing in every covered document of the agency that the agency issues or substantially revises. Defines "covered document" to: (1) mean any document that is necessary for obtaining any federal benefit or service or filing taxes, that provides information about any federal benefit or service, or that explains to the public how to comply with a requirement the federal government administers or enforces; (2) include (whether in paper or electronic form) a letter, publication, form, notice, or instruction; and (3) exclude a regulation.

Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB), by six months after enactment, to develop and issue guidance on implementing the requirements of this Act. Authorizes the Director to designate a lead agency and to use interagency working groups to assist in developing and issuing the guidance. Sets forth provisions regarding: (1) an interim guidance; (2) initial and annual compliance reports; and (3) judicial review and enforceability.

Requires the budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, to be determined by reference to the latest statement titled "Budgetary Effects of PAYGO Legislation" for this Act, submitted for printing in the Congressional Record by the Chairman of the House Budget Committee, provided that such statement has been submitted prior to the vote on passage.