Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/03/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/01/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/13/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/02/2010