There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the collective bargaining rights and procedures for review of adverse actions of certain employees of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/10/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/25/2010Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
02/13/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/10/2009Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/23/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/31/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/05/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/06/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/13/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/11/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/09/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/09/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/25/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/25/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/09/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/21/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/27/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/27/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/18/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/16/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/16/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/27/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/22/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/10/2009 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/13/2009 Referred to
03/25/2010 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.949.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.949. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/10/2009)

Repeals specified exceptions to rights of certain Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) employees to engage in collective bargaining.

Requires a final decision of the (VA) with respect to the review of an adverse personnel action against a (VA) employee to be issued not later than 60 days after such action has been appealed. Subjects such decision to judicial review in the appropriate U.S. District Court or, if the decision is made by a labor arbitrator, in the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.