Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/23/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/31/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/05/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/06/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/13/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/11/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/09/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/09/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/25/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/25/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/09/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/21/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/27/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/27/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/18/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/16/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/16/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/27/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/22/2010