Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 02/10/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/10/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/03/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/03/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/03/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/03/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/03/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/03/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/24/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/24/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/01/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/21/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/28/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/12/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 05/12/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/12/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/12/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/12/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/12/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/18/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/18/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/19/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/19/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/19/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/19/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/19/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/19/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/04/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/09/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/11/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/12/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/22/2010