There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Travel Tax Relief Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for a deduction for travel expenses to medical centers of the Department of Veterans Affairs in connection with examinations or treatments relating to service-connected disabilities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/10/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/10/2009Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/04/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/06/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/09/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/11/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/18/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/13/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/13/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/15/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/17/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/20/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/23/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/27/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/27/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/28/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/30/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/08/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/15/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/22/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/07/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/07/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/19/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/09/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/17/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/26/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/19/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/19/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/25/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/28/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/10/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.953.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.953. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/10/2009)

Veterans Travel Tax Relief Act of 2009 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow veterans a deduction from gross income for their travel expenses, including those of a family member, to a Department of Veterans Affairs medical center for treatment related to a service-connected disability or for an examination related to a claim for disability compensation or a pension.