Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/04/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/06/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/09/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/11/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/18/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/13/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/13/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/15/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/17/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/20/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/23/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/27/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/27/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/28/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/30/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/08/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/15/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/22/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/07/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/07/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/19/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/09/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/17/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/26/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/19/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/19/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/25/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/28/2010