Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/13/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/13/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/25/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/25/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 02/25/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/03/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/04/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/04/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/12/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/12/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/18/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/18/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/18/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/18/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/18/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/18/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/18/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/25/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/05/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/20/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/20/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/20/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/20/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/21/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/02/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/02/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/15/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/15/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/15/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/18/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/06/2009