Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/26/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/26/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/30/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/23/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/06/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/06/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/20/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/04/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 07/29/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/13/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 03/15/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/15/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/15/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/15/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/15/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/15/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/15/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/15/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/15/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/15/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/15/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/15/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/21/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/11/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/11/2010