Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/11/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/12/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/23/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/25/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/25/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/25/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/26/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/26/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/26/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/02/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/06/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/09/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/17/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/30/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/16/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew