Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/26/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/04/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/04/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/25/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/23/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/10/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/13/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/11/2010