Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/09/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/09/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/23/2009