Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/12/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/12/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/12/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/12/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/12/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/12/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/13/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 02/13/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/25/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/25/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/25/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/25/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/05/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/05/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/10/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/12/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/12/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/16/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/18/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/24/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/24/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/04/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/04/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/12/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/12/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/12/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/13/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/20/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/20/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/16/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/13/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 10/29/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 11/06/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/06/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/16/2010