Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/26/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/26/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/31/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/31/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/31/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/31/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/31/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/29/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/16/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/15/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/02/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 11/02/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/02/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/02/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/02/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/02/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/02/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/02/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/16/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/16/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/16/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/16/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/16/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/16/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/16/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/16/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/30/2010