There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Government Neutrality in Contracting Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To preserve open competition and Federal Government neutrality towards the labor relations of Federal Government contractors on Federal and federally funded construction projects.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/11/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/24/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
02/11/2009Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/12/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/12/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/12/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/12/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/04/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/10/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/16/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/18/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/24/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/14/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform02/11/2009 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement02/24/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.983. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2009)

Government Neutrality in Contracting Act - Directs the head of any federal agency that awards or obligates funds for any construction contract, or that awards grants, provides financial assistance, or enters into cooperative agreements for construction projects, to ensure that bid specifications, project agreements, or other controlling documents do not: (1) require or prohibit a bidder, offeror, contractor, or subcontractor from entering into, or adhering to, agreements with a labor organization, with respect to that construction project or another related construction project; or (2) otherwise discriminate against such a party because it did or did not become a signatory or otherwise adhere to such an agreement.

Allows exemptions to avert an imminent threat to public health or safety or to serve national security. Allows additional exemptions for certain projects.

Directs the Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council to amend the Federal Acquisition Regulation to implement this Act with respect to the applicable federal contracts.