Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/12/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/12/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/12/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/12/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/04/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/10/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/16/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/18/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/24/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/14/2010