Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/23/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/23/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/23/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/23/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/23/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/25/2009