There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 601 8th Street in Freedom, Pennsylvania, as the "John Scott Challis, Jr. Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/19/2009Became Public Law No: 111-51. (TXT | PDF)
08/19/2009Signed by President.
08/11/2009Presented to President.
08/04/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8714-8715)
07/30/2009Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
03/16/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 0 (Roll no. 125).(text: CR H3404)
02/11/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
08/19/2009Became Public Law No: 111-51. (TXT | PDF)
08/19/2009Signed by President.
08/11/2009HousePresented to President.
08/04/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/04/2009SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8714-8715)
07/30/2009SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 138.
07/30/2009SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
07/29/2009SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/20/2009SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
03/17/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
03/16/2009-6:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/16/2009-6:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 0 (Roll no. 125). (text: CR H3404)
03/16/2009-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3411)
03/16/2009-4:09pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/16/2009-4:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 987.
03/16/2009-4:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3404-3408)
03/16/2009-4:01pmHouseMr. Lynch moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/10/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/10/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/11/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
02/11/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform02/11/2009 Referred to
03/10/2009 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/17/2009 Referred to
07/29/2009 Markup by
07/30/2009 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security03/20/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.987.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.987. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-51 (08/19/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 601 8th Street in Freedom, Pennsylvania, as the "John Scott Challis, Jr. Post Office."