Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/12/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/26/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/26/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/26/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/26/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/26/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/26/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/26/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/26/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/26/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/26/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/26/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/26/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/26/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/26/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/05/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/05/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/05/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/05/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/05/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/05/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/12/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/12/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/12/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/08/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/08/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/08/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/08/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/08/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/18/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/18/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/14/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/14/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/14/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/14/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/14/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/28/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/28/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/16/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/20/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/20/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/20/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/16/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/27/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/27/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/11/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/09/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/09/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/14/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/16/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/18/2010