Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/11/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/11/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 02/23/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/23/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/23/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/23/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/24/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/24/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/24/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/24/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/25/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 02/25/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/25/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/02/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/02/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/02/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/02/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/02/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/03/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/10/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/12/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/16/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/21/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/28/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/16/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/21/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/08/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/14/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/15/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/19/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 05/04/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/07/2010