Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/21/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/23/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/23/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/28/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/28/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/28/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/28/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/28/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/18/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/08/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/10/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/10/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/10/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/10/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/10/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/10/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/10/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/10/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/10/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/10/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/10/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/10/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/10/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/10/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/18/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/15/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/20/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/15/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/29/2010