Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/07/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/07/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/07/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/07/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/07/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/07/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/07/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/07/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/07/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/07/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/07/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/12/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/12/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/14/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/19/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/19/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/19/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/20/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/21/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/21/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/21/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 05/21/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/21/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/21/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/21/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/21/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/02/2009