Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/12/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/12/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/21/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/11/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/19/2009