There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress for the immediate withdrawal of the Department of Labor's notice of proposed rulemaking seeking to rescind the Form LM-2.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/30/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/04/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
04/30/2009Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/30/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/30/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/30/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/07/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/07/2009

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor04/30/2009 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Workforce Protections06/04/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.116.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.116. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/30/2009)

Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the Obama Administration should immediately withdraw the Department of Labor (DOL) notice of proposed rulemaking to rescind the Form LM-2 (labor organization financial disclosure report); (2) DOL should rededicate itself to enforce the Labor-Management Reporting and Disclosure Act of 1959 and not weaken disclosures provided for in the Form LM-2 regulation; and (3) all Americans are encouraged to share their thoughts on the financial disclosure of labor organizations through the comment process on this rule which closes on May 21, 2009.