Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/06/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/06/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/06/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/06/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 05/06/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/06/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/07/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/11/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/12/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/19/2009